California 2009 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR70 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/11/2010

 BILL NUMBER: SCR 70ENROLLED BILL TEXT ADOPTED IN SENATE MAY 10, 2010 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 6, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 26, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Senator Hancock (Coauthors: Senators Pavley and DeSaulnier) (Coauthors: Assembly Members Block, Carter, Huffman, Jeffries, Jones, Lieu, Monning, Portantino, Salas, Silva, Skinner, and Solorio) FEBRUARY 9, 2010 Relative to the 22nd Annual State Scientist Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SCR 70, Hancock. 22nd Annual State Scientist Day. This measure would declare May 19, 2010, as the 22nd Annual State Scientist Day, as a tribute to the dedication and professionalism of the state scientists who work on behalf of all Californians. WHEREAS, The State of California employs nearly 3,000 professional scientists in over 30 state departments working in more than 230 scientific classifications; and WHEREAS, State scientists hold graduate degrees in virtually every scientific discipline, including nematology, virology, seismology, epidemiology, toxicology, and many others; and WHEREAS, State scientists are represented by the California Association of Professional Scientists (CAPS), which is dedicated to professionalism, independence, responsible advocacy, and ensuring that state scientists receive recognition for their important work; and WHEREAS, The work of state scientists protects the public from life-threatening diseases, safeguards our wildlife and abundant natural resources, and protects our air and water from toxic waste and pollution; and WHEREAS, State scientists are required to make critical decisions every day based on rigorous scientific factfinding and these decisions ultimately impact the lives and property of all Californians; and WHEREAS, State scientists perform important work in the areas of infectious disease prevention, oil spill prevention and cleanup, public health drinking water monitoring, the protection of agricultural crops, brownfields mitigation, chemical and radiological disaster response, and much more; and WHEREAS, State scientists host an annual State Scientist Day at the State Capitol to increase public awareness and recognition of the significant contributions made by scientists working in state government while entertaining and educating over 2,000 elementary school students with fun, hands-on science exhibits, including digging for hidden artifacts, viewing live fish in a 1,500-gallon tank, and playing Pollution Prevention "Wheel of Fortune" and Coastal Creature "Jeopardy"; and WHEREAS, State Scientist Day has sparked an interest in science for thousands of California school children, legislators, state employees, and the public who attend the special event; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That May 19, 2010, shall be recognized as the 22nd Annual State Scientist Day, and that this day shall be a tribute to the dedication and professionalism of the state scientists who work on behalf of all Californians; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.