07/07/2010 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 56, Statutes of 2010. | |||
07/07/2010 | Enrolled. To Secretary of State at 10:45 a.m. | |||
07/01/2010 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |||
07/01/2010 | Read and adopted. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 5928.) To Senate. | |||
06/22/2010 | From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) To Third Reading. (Heard in committee on June 21.) | |||
04/29/2010 | To Com. on NAT. RES. | |||
04/26/2010 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |||
04/26/2010 | Read and adopted. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 3324.) To Assembly. | |||
04/20/2010 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
04/19/2010 | Read third time. Amended. To second reading. | |||
04/14/2010 | Withdrawn from committee. Placed on third reading. | |||
02/18/2010 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. |