05/24/2010 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 22, Statutes of 2010. | |||
05/24/2010 | Enrolled. To Secretary of State at 3:45 p.m. | |||
05/20/2010 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |||
05/20/2010 | Read and adopted. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 5237.) To Senate. | |||
05/14/2010 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on May 13.) | |||
04/19/2010 | To Com. on RULES. | |||
04/15/2010 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |||
04/15/2010 | Read and adopted. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 3192.) To Assembly. | |||
03/24/2010 | Withdrawn from committee. Placed on third reading. | |||
02/24/2010 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. |