06/08/2010 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 37, Statutes of 2010. | |||
06/08/2010 | Enrolled. To Secretary of State at 10:15 a.m. | |||
06/03/2010 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |||
06/02/2010 | Read and adopted. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5528.) To Senate. | |||
05/28/2010 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on May 28.) | |||
05/20/2010 | To Com. on RULES. | |||
05/10/2010 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |||
05/10/2010 | Read and adopted. (Ayes 30. Noes 0. Page 3473.) To Assembly. | |||
03/24/2010 | Withdrawn from committee. Placed on third reading. | |||
02/24/2010 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. |