LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SCR86
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SCR86
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SCR86
Compare Versions
SCR86 Chaptered September 7, 2010
SCR86 Enrolled September 2, 2010
SCR86 Amended August 12, 2010
SCR86 Amended July 15, 2010
SCR86 Introduced March 9, 2010
Version 1 (Old)
SCR86 Chaptered September 7, 2010
SCR86 Enrolled September 2, 2010
SCR86 Amended August 12, 2010
SCR86 Amended July 15, 2010
SCR86 Introduced March 9, 2010
Version 2 (New)
Compare