08/04/2010 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 68, Statutes of 2010. | |||
08/04/2010 | Enrolled. To Secretary of State at 3:45 p.m. | |||
08/02/2010 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |||
08/02/2010 | Read and adopted. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6007.) To Senate. | |||
06/30/2010 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 30.) | |||
06/15/2010 | From committee: Be adopted, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 14.) | |||
06/03/2010 | To Com. on TRANS. | |||
05/27/2010 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |||
05/27/2010 | Read and adopted. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 3626.) To Assembly. | |||
05/25/2010 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |||
05/24/2010 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be placed on Consent Calendar. | |||
05/14/2010 | Set for hearing May 24. | |||
05/05/2010 | From committee: Be adopted, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3446.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/06/2010 | Set for hearing May 4. | |||
03/17/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | |||
03/15/2010 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. |