California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR9 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 07/14/2009

 BILL NUMBER: SCR 9CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 71 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE JULY 14, 2009 ADOPTED IN SENATE APRIL 23, 2009 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY JULY 9, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Senator Wiggins JANUARY 15, 2009 Relative to the James F. McManus Memorial Bridge. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SCR 9, Wiggins. The James F. McManus Memorial Bridge. This measure would designate the Salmon Creek Bridge on State Highway Route 101 in Humboldt County as the James F. McManus Memorial Bridge. The measure would also request the Department of Transportation to determine the cost of appropriate signs showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, to erect those signs. WHEREAS, James F. McManus is deserving of special public commendation in recognition of his exemplary career with the Department of Transportation (Caltrans) for nearly 40 years; and WHEREAS, James F. McManus was born on May 29, 1929, in Oakland, California. His love for engineering and flying was stimulated by his father's work with the Univac Supercomputer, which was used to schedule the then-secret B-19 Bomber project during World War II; and WHEREAS, James F. McManus attended City College of San Francisco, until he joined the United States Marine Corps during the Korean War. He later returned to college at San Jose State University; and WHEREAS, In 1954, James F. McManus began his career at Caltrans as a junior civil engineer and immediately impressed his supervisors with his engineering abilities; and WHEREAS, During his 18-year tenure in District 1 of Caltrans, James F. McManus moved from construction to the laboratory, where he tested materials for roadways, and ultimately into design, planning, and project management, where he worked on the design of numerous highway and freeway projects; and WHEREAS, After the 1964 flood incident in northern California, James F. McManus worked on the Highway 101 freeway project and designed a five-mile stretch of the Redwood Freeway south of Myers Flat. He was particularly proud of this project because, in addition to bypassing Myers Flat and avoiding impact to the old growth redwoods and parks south of the Eel River, he successfully convinced the district leadership to change the original alignment of the highway to create his vision of a panoramic view of the magnificent Eel River. The Myers Flat Bypass included five bridges across the Eel River and its tributaries, including the Salmon Creek Bridge; and WHEREAS, As a leader of the district computer section, James F. McManus developed a revolutionary computer program called MANSCAN, which scheduled the manpower across the many professional disciplines required to design and construct each major project and thereby allowed projects to be more efficiently tracked and planned. This program was renamed PYPSCAN and was used for purposes of program management for many decades; and WHEREAS, Following his many achievements in District 1, James F. McManus was promoted in 1972 to work in the department's headquarters in Sacramento, California, as a senior transportation engineer; and WHEREAS, James F. McManus became a principal engineer in 1982, and was promoted to Deputy Director of District 7 in Los Angeles in 1984, where he oversaw the planning, design, and construction of the monumental Century Freeway project and won Engineer of the Year for Caltrans as a result; and WHEREAS, In 1986, James F. McManus moved back to Sacramento, California, and was promoted to Career Executive, Level 3. He finished his career as Deputy Chief Engineer and managed programs for the entire state from 1988 until his retirement in 1992; and WHEREAS, Throughout his career, James F. McManus was a man of the highest quality and integrity and a dedicated and creative member of the Caltrans engineering organization; and WHEREAS, After 38 years of service, James F. McManus retired from Caltrans on October 7, 1992, and died on December 2, 2006; and WHEREAS, It is appropriate to recognize James F. McManus' many years of dedicated service to Caltrans and to the people of California by designating the Salmon Creek Bridge in his memory; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Salmon Creek Bridge (Bridge No. 4-176, postmile 23.9) on State Highway Route 101 in Humboldt County shall be designated as the James F. McManus Memorial Bridge; and be it further Resolved, That the Department of Transportation is requested to determine the cost of appropriate signs, consistent with the signing requirements for the state highway system, showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources sufficient to cover that cost, to erect those signs; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the Director of Transportation and to the author for appropriate distribution.