08/11/2010 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |||
08/11/2010 | Read and adopted. (Ayes 22. Noes 12. Page 4450.) To Assembly. | |||
06/30/2010 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
06/29/2010 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |||
06/18/2010 | Set for hearing June 28. | |||
06/16/2010 | From committee: Be adopted, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 3. Page 3930.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
05/24/2010 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | |||
05/18/2010 | Set for hearing June 15. | |||
04/27/2010 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
04/21/2010 | Set for hearing May 4. | |||
04/15/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | |||
03/18/2010 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. |