06/02/2010 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 27, Statutes of 2010. | |||
06/02/2010 | Enrolled. To Secretary of State at 9:30 a.m. | |||
05/27/2010 | Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 3620.) To enrollment. | |||
05/18/2010 | In Senate. To unfinished business. | |||
05/17/2010 | Read, amended, and adopted. (Page 5195.) To Senate. | |||
05/03/2010 | To Com. on RULES. From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) To Third Reading. (Heard in committee on May 3.) | |||
04/29/2010 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |||
04/29/2010 | Withdrawn from committee. To Special Consent Calendar. Read and adopted. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 3380.) To Assembly. | |||
04/05/2010 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. |