09/25/2009 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 124, Statutes of 2009. | |||
09/25/2009 | Enrolled. To Secretary of State at 11 a.m. | |||
09/10/2009 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |||
09/09/2009 | Read and adopted. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 3232.) To Senate. | |||
09/04/2009 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 27.) | |||
07/13/2009 | To Com. on V.A. | |||
06/26/2009 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |||
06/26/2009 | Read and adopted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1491.) To Assembly. | |||
06/25/2009 | Withdrawn from committee. To Special Consent Calendar. | |||
05/28/2009 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. |