08/24/2009 | To Com. on PUB. S. | |||
08/17/2009 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |||
08/17/2009 | Read and adopted. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 1842.) To Assembly. | |||
07/15/2009 | To Special Consent Calendar. | |||
07/14/2009 | Amended. Placed on third reading. | |||
07/13/2009 | From committee: Be adopted as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1641.) | |||
06/30/2009 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. (Corrected July 9.) | |||
06/26/2009 | Set for hearing July 7. | |||
06/22/2009 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |||
06/18/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |||
06/01/2009 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. |