06/28/2010 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 45, Statutes of 2010. | |||
06/28/2010 | Enrolled. To Secretary of State at 4:50 p.m. | |||
06/21/2010 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |||
06/21/2010 | Read and adopted. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5746.) To Senate. | |||
06/16/2010 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 15.) | |||
08/20/2009 | To Com. on HEALTH. | |||
07/16/2009 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |||
07/16/2009 | Read and adopted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1764.) To Assembly. | |||
07/13/2009 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |||
07/09/2009 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) | |||
07/03/2009 | Set for hearing July 8. | |||
07/01/2009 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
06/19/2009 | Set for hearing July 1. | |||
06/18/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |||
06/02/2009 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. |