08/31/2010 | Motion to reconsider continued to August 31. | |||
08/30/2010 | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 37. Noes 29. Page 6873.) Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Ammiano. | |||
06/16/2010 | From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 10. Noes 5.) To Third Reading. (Heard in committee on June 15.) | |||
08/27/2009 | To Com. on HEALTH. | |||
08/25/2009 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |||
08/24/2009 | Read and adopted. (Ayes 23. Noes 15. Page 1911.) To Assembly. | |||
07/16/2009 | From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) To Third Reading. | |||
07/07/2009 | Set for hearing July 15. | |||
07/06/2009 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
07/03/2009 | Set for hearing July 9. | |||
06/30/2009 | Set for hearing July 8. | |||
06/25/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |||
06/08/2009 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. |