04/26/2010 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 7, Statutes of 2010. | |||
04/26/2010 | Enrolled. To Secretary of State at 2:45 p.m. | |||
04/22/2010 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 46. Noes 21. Page 4815.) To Senate. In Senate. To enrollment. | |||
04/13/2010 | From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) To Third Reading. (Heard in committee on April 12.) | |||
01/21/2010 | To Com. on NAT. RES. | |||
09/10/2009 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |||
09/09/2009 | Read and adopted. (Ayes 23. Noes 13. Page 2338.) To Assembly. | |||
08/27/2009 | From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1987.) To Third Reading. | |||
08/21/2009 | Set for hearing August 26. | |||
08/19/2009 | To Com. on EQ. | |||
07/23/2009 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. |