06/02/2010 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 30, Statutes of 2010. | |||
06/02/2010 | Enrolled. To Secretary of State at 9:30 a.m. | |||
05/27/2010 | Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 22. Noes 9. Page 3619.) To enrollment. | |||
05/18/2010 | In Senate. To unfinished business. | |||
05/17/2010 | Read, amended, and adopted. (Ayes 48. Noes 23. Page 5194.) To Senate. | |||
04/27/2010 | From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) To Third Reading. (Heard in committee on April 27.) | |||
04/15/2010 | To Com. on W.,P. & W. | |||
04/08/2010 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |||
04/08/2010 | Read and adopted. (Ayes 23. Noes 11. Page 3114.) To Assembly. | |||
04/06/2010 | Read second time. Amended. To third reading. (April 6 amended version corrected April 15.) | |||
04/05/2010 | From committee: Be adopted as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 3. Page 3002.) | |||
03/19/2010 | Set for hearing March 23. | |||
01/07/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | |||
08/25/2009 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. |