08/27/2009 | Held in committee and under submission. | |||
07/01/2009 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |||
06/24/2009 | From committee: Be adopted, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 23.) | |||
04/30/2009 | To Com. on HIGHER ED. | |||
04/23/2009 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |||
04/23/2009 | Read and adopted. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 622.) To Assembly. | |||
04/21/2009 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
04/20/2009 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |||
04/14/2009 | Set for hearing April 20. | |||
04/01/2009 | From committee: Be adopted, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 397.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
03/16/2009 | Set for hearing April 1. | |||
03/09/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |||
02/25/2009 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. |