07/07/2010 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 57, Statutes of 2010. | |||
07/07/2010 | Enrolled. To Secretary of State at 10:45 a.m. | |||
07/01/2010 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |||
07/01/2010 | Read and adopted. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5930.) To Senate. | |||
06/29/2010 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 28.) | |||
06/03/2010 | To Com. on REV. & TAX. | |||
05/24/2010 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |||
05/24/2010 | Read and adopted. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 3587.) To Assembly. | |||
05/17/2010 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |||
05/13/2010 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3548.) | |||
05/05/2010 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |||
04/30/2010 | Set for hearing May 12. | |||
04/29/2010 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
04/20/2010 | Set for hearing April 28. | |||
02/04/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |||
01/25/2010 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. |