06/28/2010 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 47, Statutes of 2010. | |||
06/28/2010 | Enrolled. To Secretary of State at 4:50 p.m. | |||
06/24/2010 | Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 29. Noes 0. Page 4055.) To enrollment. | |||
06/22/2010 | In Senate. To unfinished business. | |||
06/21/2010 | Read, amended, and adopted. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 5740.) To Senate. | |||
06/16/2010 | From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) To Third Reading. (Heard in committee on June 15.) | |||
04/15/2010 | To Com. on V.A. | |||
02/25/2010 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |||
02/25/2010 | Read and adopted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2884.) To Assembly. | |||
02/22/2010 | Withdrawn from committee. Placed on third reading. | |||
01/26/2010 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. (Introduced measure version corrected February 19.) |