07/06/2010 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 53, Statutes of 2010. | |||
07/06/2010 | Enrolled. To Secretary of State at 2:45 p.m. | |||
06/28/2010 | Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 22. Noes 5. Page 4095.) To enrollment. | |||
06/21/2010 | In Senate. To unfinished business. | |||
06/17/2010 | Read, amended, and adopted. (Ayes 54. Noes 1. Page 5699.) To Senate. | |||
06/15/2010 | From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) To Third Reading. (Heard in committee on June 15.) | |||
06/03/2010 | To Com. on JUD. | |||
05/27/2010 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |||
05/27/2010 | Read and adopted. (Ayes 24. Noes 0. Page 3622.) To Assembly. | |||
04/22/2010 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
04/21/2010 | Read third time. Amended. To second reading. | |||
04/15/2010 | Withdrawn from committee. Placed on third reading. | |||
02/22/2010 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. |