LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SJR27
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SJR27
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SJR27
Action History
06/17/2010
In Assembly. Held at Desk.
06/17/2010
Read and adopted. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 3941.) To Assembly.
06/15/2010
Read second time. To third reading.
06/14/2010
Read third time. Amended. To second reading.
05/12/2010
Withdrawn from committee. Placed on third reading.
05/04/2010
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
03/25/2010
Introduced. To Com. on RLS.