09/07/2010 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 137, Statutes of 2010. | |||
09/07/2010 | Enrolled. To Secretary of State at 2 p.m. | |||
08/25/2010 | Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 21. Noes 8. Page 4891.) To enrollment. | |||
08/24/2010 | In Senate. To unfinished business. | |||
08/23/2010 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 49. Noes 25. Page 6510.) To Senate. | |||
08/16/2010 | Amended. Placed on third reading. | |||
08/13/2010 | From committee: Be adopted as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (Heard in committee August 10.) | |||
06/21/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
06/17/2010 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |||
06/17/2010 | Read and adopted. (Ayes 22. Noes 9. Page 3940.) To Assembly. | |||
06/16/2010 | From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 3925.) To Third Reading. | |||
06/03/2010 | Set for hearing June 15. | |||
04/29/2010 | To Com. on JUD. | |||
03/25/2010 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. |