08/20/2010 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 99, Statutes of 2010. | |||
08/20/2010 | Enrolled. To Secretary of State at 11:45 a.m. | |||
08/12/2010 | In Senate. To enrollment. (Enrolled measure version corrected August 16.) | |||
08/12/2010 | Read and adopted. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6181.) To Senate. | |||
08/10/2010 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 9.) | |||
06/21/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |||
06/17/2010 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |||
06/17/2010 | Read and adopted. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 3945.) To Assembly. | |||
06/10/2010 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |||
06/09/2010 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 3. Noes 0. Page 3826.) | |||
06/03/2010 | Set for hearing June 9. | |||
05/24/2010 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |||
05/03/2010 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. (May 3 amended version corrected May 5.) | |||
04/07/2010 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. |