07/06/2010 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 54, Statutes of 2010. | |||
07/06/2010 | Enrolled. To Secretary of State at 2:45 p.m. | |||
06/28/2010 | Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 4098.) To enrollment. | |||
06/23/2010 | To Special Consent Calendar. | |||
06/21/2010 | In Senate. To unfinished business. | |||
06/21/2010 | Read and adopted. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5747.) To Senate. | |||
06/16/2010 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 15.) | |||
06/07/2010 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. | |||
05/20/2010 | To Com. on HUM. S. | |||
05/13/2010 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |||
05/13/2010 | Read and adopted. (Ayes 29. Noes 0. Page 3515.) To Assembly. | |||
05/11/2010 | Read second time. Amended. To third reading. | |||
05/10/2010 | From committee: Be adopted as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3467.) | |||
04/30/2010 | Set for hearing May 5. | |||
04/29/2010 | To Com. on HEALTH. | |||
04/27/2010 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. |