08/20/2010 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 100, Statutes of 2010. | |||
08/20/2010 | Enrolled. To Secretary of State at 11:45 a.m. | |||
08/17/2010 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |||
08/16/2010 | Read and adopted. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 6258.) To Senate. | |||
08/09/2010 | From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) To Third Reading. (Heard in committee on August 9.) | |||
08/05/2010 | To Com. on TRANS. | |||
08/02/2010 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |||
08/02/2010 | Read and adopted. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4310.) To Assembly. | |||
07/01/2010 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |||
06/30/2010 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 4178.) | |||
06/25/2010 | Set for hearing June 29. | |||
06/23/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | |||
05/24/2010 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. |