08/04/2010 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 71, Statutes of 2010. | |||
08/04/2010 | Enrolled. To Secretary of State at 3:45 p.m. | |||
08/02/2010 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |||
08/02/2010 | Read and adopted. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6006.) To Senate. | |||
06/30/2010 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 30.) | |||
06/21/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. | |||
06/17/2010 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |||
06/17/2010 | Withdrawn from committee. Read and adopted. (Ayes 26. Noes 0. Page 3940.) To Assembly. | |||
06/01/2010 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. |