08/27/2009 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 87, Statutes of 2009. | |||
08/27/2009 | Enrolled. To Secretary of State at 9 a.m. | |||
08/24/2009 | Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 32. Noes 1. Page 1909.) To enrollment. | |||
08/17/2009 | In Senate. To unfinished business. | |||
08/17/2009 | Read and adopted. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 2614.) To Senate. | |||
07/08/2009 | From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) To Third Reading. (Heard in committee on July 7.) | |||
05/20/2009 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. | |||
04/30/2009 | To Com. on AGING & L.T.C. | |||
04/23/2009 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |||
04/23/2009 | Withdrawn from committee. Read and adopted. (Ayes 32. Noes 1. Page 625.) To Assembly. | |||
03/23/2009 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. |