09/11/2009 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 96, Statutes of 2009. | |||
09/11/2009 | Enrolled. To Secretary of State at 3:30 p.m. | |||
09/02/2009 | Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 23. Noes 13. Page 2126.) To enrollment. | |||
08/24/2009 | In Senate. To unfinished business. | |||
08/20/2009 | Read and adopted. (Ayes 50. Noes 26. Page 2671.) To Senate. | |||
07/14/2009 | Amended. Placed on third reading. | |||
07/13/2009 | From committee: Be adopted as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (Heard in committee on July 8.) | |||
06/30/2009 | To Com. on NAT. RES. | |||
06/22/2009 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |||
06/22/2009 | Read and adopted. (Ayes 23. Noes 12. Page 1374.) To Assembly. | |||
06/08/2009 | Withdrawn from committee. Placed on third reading. Read third time. Refused adoption. (Ayes 20. Noes 10. Page 1221.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Wiggins. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 1221.) | |||
03/25/2009 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. |