06/30/2009 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 60, Statutes of 2009. | |||
06/30/2009 | Enrolled. To Secretary of State at 9 a.m. | |||
06/25/2009 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |||
06/25/2009 | Read and adopted. (Ayes 70. Noes 2. Page 2261.) To Senate. | |||
06/23/2009 | From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) To Third Reading. (Heard in committee on June 22.) | |||
05/21/2009 | To Com. on TRANS. | |||
05/11/2009 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |||
05/11/2009 | Read and adopted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 827.) To Assembly. | |||
05/06/2009 | To Special Consent Calendar. | |||
05/04/2009 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
04/30/2009 | Read third time. Amended. To second reading. | |||
04/16/2009 | Withdrawn from committee. Placed on third reading. | |||
04/01/2009 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. |