08/24/2009 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 85, Statutes of 2009. | |||
08/24/2009 | Enrolled. To Secretary of State at 2 p.m. | |||
08/17/2009 | Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 1841.) To enrollment. | |||
07/15/2009 | To Special Consent Calendar. | |||
07/13/2009 | In Senate. To unfinished business. | |||
07/09/2009 | Read, amended, and adopted. (Ayes 67. Noes 2. Page 2436.) To Senate. | |||
06/24/2009 | From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) To Third Reading. (Heard in committee on June 23.) | |||
06/08/2009 | To Com. on HEALTH. | |||
05/21/2009 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |||
05/21/2009 | Read and adopted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 971.) To Assembly. | |||
05/14/2009 | Withdrawn from committee. Placed on third reading. | |||
04/20/2009 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. |