02/01/2012 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
05/27/2011 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |||
04/13/2011 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
03/31/2011 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (March 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
03/15/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. Measure version as amended on March 14 corrected. | |||
03/14/2011 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended. | |||
01/24/2011 | Referred to Com. on L. & E. | |||
12/07/2010 | From printer. May be heard in committee January 6. | |||
12/06/2010 | Read first time. To print. |