03/16/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5. From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (March 16). Ordered to third reading. Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 2. Page 352.). | |||
03/15/2011 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
03/14/2011 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |||
03/07/2011 | Ordered to second reading. Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
02/22/2011 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
02/22/2011 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 0. Page 416.) | |||
02/18/2011 | Without reference to committee. Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
01/11/2011 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 10. | |||
01/10/2011 | Read first time. To print. |