|
06/13/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 27, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:15 p.m.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2011
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2011
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1353.).
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/06/2011
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1513.).
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 18).
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 4).
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Referred to Com. on G.O. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|