|
09/26/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 324, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
09/26/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/16/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2011
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2846.).
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2127.).
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 15).
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 1344.)
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 4).
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
Measure version as amended on April 13 corrected.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 11).
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
03/30/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/14/2011
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|