|
10/08/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 580, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 72. Noes 5. Page 2727.).
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 31 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2081.).
|
|
|
|
08/16/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/12/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 5).
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
|
06/06/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 4. Page 1855.)
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1690.)
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 18).
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2011
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 25).
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/14/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on U. & C. and L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|