LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1034
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1034
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1034
Compare Versions
AB1034 Enrolled September 20, 2011
AB1034 Amended August 31, 2011
AB1034 Amended June 28, 2011
AB1034 Amended May 27, 2011
AB1034 Amended April 15, 2011
AB1034 Amended April 6, 2011
AB1034 Amended March 16, 2011
AB1034 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB1034 Enrolled September 20, 2011
AB1034 Amended August 31, 2011
AB1034 Amended June 28, 2011
AB1034 Amended May 27, 2011
AB1034 Amended April 15, 2011
AB1034 Amended April 6, 2011
AB1034 Amended March 16, 2011
AB1034 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare