|
10/09/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 688, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2166.).
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 25).
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (July 5).
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 1344.)
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 4).
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Referred to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|