California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1042 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 09/02/2011

 BILL NUMBER: AB 1042ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 30, 2011 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY MAY 12, 2011 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 31, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Allen FEBRUARY 18, 2011 An act to amend Section 20098 of the Government Code, relating to public employees' retirement. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1042, Allen. Public employees' retirement. The Public Employees' Retirement Law (PERL) vests the management and control of the Public Employees' Retirement System in the Board of Administration. PERL requires the board to appoint and fix the compensation of an executive officer, a general counsel, a chief actuary, a chief investment officer, and other investment officers and portfolio managers, as specified. This bill would additionally require the board to appoint and fix the compensation of a chief financial officer. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 20098 of the Government Code is amended to read: 20098. (a) The board shall appoint and, notwithstanding Sections 19816, 19825, 19826, 19829, and 19832 shall fix the compensation of an executive officer, a general counsel, a chief actuary, a chief investment officer, a chief financial officer, and other investment officers and portfolio managers whose positions are designated managerial pursuant to Section 18801.1. (b) The executive officer, deputy executive officers, and the assistant executive officers may administer oaths. (c) When fixing the compensation for the positions specified in subdivision (a), the board shall be guided by the principles contained in Sections 19826 and 19829, consistent with its fiduciary responsibility to its members to recruit and retain highly qualified and effective employees for these positions. (d) When a position specified in subdivision (a) is filled through a general civil service appointment, it shall be filled from an eligible list based on an examination that was held on an open basis, and tenure in the position shall be subject to the provisions of Article 2 (commencing with Section 19590) of Chapter 7 of Part 2 of Division 5 of Title 2. In addition to the causes for action specified in that article, the board may take action under the article for causes related to its fiduciary responsibility to its members, including the employee's failure to meet specified performance objectives. (e) An individual who held a position designated in subdivision (a), or was a member of the board, a deputy executive officer, or an assistant executive officer, shall not, for a period of two years after leaving that position, for compensation, act as agent or attorney for, or otherwise represent, any other person, except the state, by making any formal or informal appearance before, or any oral or written communication to, the Public Employees' Retirement System, or any officer or employee thereof, if the appearance or communication is made for the purpose of influencing administrative or legislative action or any action or proceeding involving the issuance, amendment, awarding, or revocation of a permit, license, grant, contract, or sale or purchase of goods or property.