California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1047 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2011

Enrolled

Bill July 5, 2012

Chaptered

Bill July 13, 2012

Amended

Bill May 30, 2012
Bill January 12, 2012
Bill January 4, 2012