|
08/31/2012
|
Bill died on call (pursuant to Article IV, Section 10(c)). Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 20. Noes 17. Page 5118.).
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 19. Noes 17. Page 5035.). Motion to reconsider made by Senator Kehoe. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5036.)
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/19/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
06/06/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2012
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
01/26/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
01/26/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 26. Page 3596.)
|
|
|
|
01/19/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (January 19).
|
|
|
|
01/10/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (January 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
01/04/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
03/14/2011
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|