|
10/02/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 403, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/02/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3213.).
|
|
|
|
09/08/2011
|
Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 23. Noes 14. Page 2392.) Ordered to third reading. Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2422.).
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Ayes 21. Noes 14. Page 2368.) From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 25).
|
|
|
|
07/12/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (July 6).
|
|
|
|
06/29/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 26. Page 1802.)
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 27). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|