California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1074 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2011

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2011

Chaptered

Bill September 21, 2011

Amended

Bill August 15, 2011
Bill July 12, 2011
Bill May 16, 2011