LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1075
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1075
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1075
Action History
02/01/2012
Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
04/28/2011
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
03/30/2011
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
03/14/2011
Referred to Com. on ED.
02/20/2011
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
02/18/2011
Read first time. To print.