|
07/15/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 87, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:15 p.m.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2011
|
Enrolled measure version corrected.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2011
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 59. Noes 15. Page 2075.).
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 10. Page 1535.).
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 8).
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 66. Noes 6. Page 1170.)
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 13).
|
|
|
|
03/30/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|