|
09/01/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 31). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2012
|
Joint Rule 61(b)(15) suspended. (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 5056.) Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Ayes 22. Noes 9. Page 5056.)
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Ayes 22. Noes 3. Page 4980.) From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 3. Page 1780.)
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/14/2011
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|