LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1097
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1097
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1097
Compare Versions
AB1097 Chaptered October 2, 2011
AB1097 Enrolled September 9, 2011
AB1097 Amended August 29, 2011
AB1097 Amended August 17, 2011
AB1097 Amended June 13, 2011
AB1097 Amended April 25, 2011
AB1097 Amended April 7, 2011
AB1097 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB1097 Chaptered October 2, 2011
AB1097 Enrolled September 9, 2011
AB1097 Amended August 29, 2011
AB1097 Amended August 17, 2011
AB1097 Amended June 13, 2011
AB1097 Amended April 25, 2011
AB1097 Amended April 7, 2011
AB1097 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare