|
06/26/2012
|
In committee: Set, final hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/06/2012
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/12/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (July 5).
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1756.)
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
04/06/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/17/2011
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|