|
09/29/2012
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2012
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/12/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:35 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 13. Page 4944.).
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
From inactive file. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Negrete McLeod.
|
|
|
|
08/07/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 6).
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 22. Page 1235.)
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (April 13).
|
|
|
|
03/30/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (March 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/17/2011
|
Referred to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|