02/01/2012 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
05/18/2011 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
05/05/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
05/04/2011 | Read second time and amended. | |||
05/03/2011 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 2). | |||
04/27/2011 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | |||
04/12/2011 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
03/17/2011 | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and TRANS. | |||
02/20/2011 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | |||
02/18/2011 | Read first time. To print. |