|
06/28/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 30, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:55 p.m.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 52. Noes 26. Page 1954.).
|
|
|
|
06/13/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 15 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2011
|
Pursuant to Joint Rule 33.1, Joint Rule 10.5 suspended by unanimous consent. (Page 1369.) Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 15. Page 1372.).
|
|
|
|
06/09/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
03/07/2011
|
Ordered to second reading. Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 0. Page 420.)
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Without reference to committee. Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
01/11/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 10.
|
|
|
|
01/10/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|