California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB112 Amended / Bill

Filed 06/08/2011

 BILL NUMBER: AB 112AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 8, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Committee on Budget (Blumenfield (Chair), Alejo, Allen, Brownley, Buchanan, Butler, Cedillo, Chesbro, Dickinson, Feuer, Gordon, Huffman, Mitchell, Monning, and Swanson) JANUARY 10, 2011  An act relating to the Budget Act of 2011.   An act to add Items 7100-002-0871 and 7100-013-0890 to Section 2.00 of the Budget Act of 2010 (Chapter 712 of the Statutes of 2010), relating to the support of state government, making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, Budget Bill.  LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 112, as amended, Committee on Budget. Budget Act of  2011.   2010: revisions.   The Budget Act of 2010 (Chapter 712 of the Statutes of 2010) made appropriations for the support of state government during the 2010-11 fiscal year.   This bill would amend the Budget Act of 2010 by providing for the transfer of $48,000,000 from the Federal Trust Fund to the Unemployment Fund and appropriation of that amount from the Unemployment Fund to the Employment Development Department for unemployment insurance administration, including the costs of processing the claims workload associated with the alternate base period program. The bill would provide that these moneys are available for expenditure from July 1, 2012, to June 30, 2015, inclusive.   This bill would declare that it is to take effect immediately as a Budget Bill.   This bill would express the intent of the Legislature to enact statutory changes relating to the Budget Act of 2011.  Vote: majority. Appropriation:  no   yes  . Fiscal committee:  no   yes  . State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS:  SECTION 1.   Item 7100-002-0871 is added to Section 2.00 of the   Budget Act of 2010   , to read:     7100-002-0871--For support of the Employment   Development Department, for Program 21-Tax   Collections and Benefit Payments, payable from 48,000,00   the Unemployment Fund--Federal.................. 0   Provisions:   1. (a) Funds appropriated in this   item are set aside for   unemployment insurance   administration, including   the costs of processing the   claims workload associated   with the alternate base   period program. These moneys   are appropriated only for   this purpose and shall not   be used for any other   purpose. These moneys are   available for expenditure   from July 1, 2012, to June   30, 2015, inclusive.   (b) These moneys shall be   expended in accordance with   guidance provided by the   United States Department of   Labor in Unemployment   Insurance Program Letter No.  14-09 and Training and   Employment Guidance Letter   No. 18-01.     SEC. 2.   Item 7100-013-0890 is added to Section 2.00 of the   Budget Act of 2010   , to read:     7100-013-0890--For support of the   Employment Development Department,   payable from the Federal Trust Fund, for   transfer to the Unemployment Fund-   -Federal.................................. (48,000,000)     SEC. 3.   This act is a Budget Bill within the meaning of subdivision (e) of Section 12 of Article IV of the California Constitution and shall take effect immediately.   SECTION 1.   It is the intent of the Legislature to enact statutory changes relating to the Budget Act of 2011.